AL HB172 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Delivered to Governor at 6:38 p.m. on March 18, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Delivered to Governor at 6:38 p.m. on March 18, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pelham, prisoner transport fee authorized for transporting defendants on misdemeanor warrants from another municipal jail
Title
Pelham, prisoner transport fee authorized for transporting defendants on misdemeanor warrants from another municipal jail
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:38 p.m. on March 18, 2014. |
2014-03-18 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-206. |
2014-03-18 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 794 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2014-02-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 258 |
2014-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation |