AL HB17 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Pending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms, pistol permits, provide deadline for sheriff to issue or reinstate an appellant's pistol permit after a successul appeal, Sec. 13A-11-75 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms, pistol permits, provide deadline for sheriff to issue or reinstate an appellant's pistol permit after a successul appeal, Sec. 13A-11-75 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenatePending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Judiciary
2019-04-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2019-04-02HouseEngrossed
2019-04-02HouseMooney intended to vote "Yea"
2019-04-02HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 83
2019-04-02HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 82
2019-04-02HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-03-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-03-05HouseRereferred from Judy to PS&HS
2019-03-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback