AL HB17 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Constitution, Campaigns and Elections second Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Vacancies, United States Senator, temporary appointment by Governor until next general election authorized, Sec. 36-9-7 am'd; Sec. 36-9-8 repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacancies, United States Senator, temporary appointment by Governor until next general election authorized, Sec. 36-9-7 am'd; Sec. 36-9-8 repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 73 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseConstitution, Campaigns and Elections second Amendment Offered
2018-02-15SenatePending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Constitution, Ethics and Elections
2018-02-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections
2018-01-23HouseEngrossed
2018-01-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 78
2018-01-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 77
2018-01-23HouseClouse Amendment Offered
2018-01-23HouseClouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 76
2018-01-23HouseClouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 75
2018-01-23HouseConstitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment to CCE Amdt Offered
2018-01-23HouseConstitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered
2018-01-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB17&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB17-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB17-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189612-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189491-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190357-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190367-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=582673&VOTE=76&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=582700&VOTE=75&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=582702&VOTE=77&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=582760&VOTE=78&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback