AL HB17 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p. m. on April 12, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p. m. on April 12, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Property, crimes of falsely removing an instrument from recording and falsely filing instruments against public official, penalties, transfer of proceedings for removal to circuit court, Sec. 13A-9-12 am'd.
Title
Property, crimes of falsely removing an instrument from recording and falsely filing instruments against public official, penalties, transfer of proceedings for removal to circuit court, Sec. 13A-9-12 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-14 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-14 - House - Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-04-14 - House - Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p. m. on April 12, 2012. | |
2012-04-12 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-12 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-12 | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment | |
2012-04-12 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 570 | |
2012-04-12 | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment | |
2012-04-10 | Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 643 | |
2012-04-10 | Executive Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-10 | Forwarded to Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-03 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-04-03 | Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 546 | |
2012-04-03 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 425 | |
2012-03-22 | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 424 | |
2012-03-22 | Ward Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-23 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 120 | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 119 | |
2012-02-23 | Clouse Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 118 | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 117 | |
2012-02-23 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |