AL HB168 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to public works contracts; to amend Sections 39-1-1, 39-2-1, 39-2-2, and 39-2-6, Code of Alabama 1975, to increase the threshold dollar amount for which competitive bidding is generally required; to further provide for certain notice procedures; to authorize the publication of notice by electronic means; to authorize the use of electronic sealed bids; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Title
Relating to public works contracts; to amend Sections 39-1-1, 39-2-1, 39-2-2, and 39-2-6, Code of Alabama 1975, to increase the threshold dollar amount for which competitive bidding is generally required; to further provide for certain notice procedures; to authorize the publication of notice by electronic means; to authorize the use of electronic sealed bids; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - Adopt BD88JJ-1 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - Adopt BD88JJ-1 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | House | Enacted |
2023-06-01 | House | Enrolled |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-06-01 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2023-05-24 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-23 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-23 | House | Adopt BD88JJ-1 |
2023-05-23 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-11 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported Favorably from House State Government |
2023-05-10 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House State Government BD88JJ-1 |
2023-05-10 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House State Government G0R166-1 |
2023-05-10 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House State Government 50XZM6-1 |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced and Referred to House State Government |
2023-03-21 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |