AL HB168 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Guardianship and Protective Proceeding Uniform Act, disabled persons and minors, leasing of oil, gas, and mineral rights authorized, Sec. 26-2A-137 am'd.
Title
Guardianship and Protective Proceeding Uniform Act, disabled persons and minors, leasing of oil, gas, and mineral rights authorized, Sec. 26-2A-137 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017. |
2017-05-02 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-245. |
2017-05-02 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-04-27 | House | Enrolled |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 754 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2017-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 386 |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |