AL HB168 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ethics, statement of economic interests, filing, minimum threshold increased, certain employees exempt, Sec. 36-25-14 am'd.
Title
Ethics, statement of economic interests, filing, minimum threshold increased, certain employees exempt, Sec. 36-25-14 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Further Consideration | |
2011-06-02 | Ross motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-06-02 | Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2011-05-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 313 | |
2011-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance |