AL HB167 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Massage Therapy, Board of, massage therapists further regulated, penalties increased, Secs. 34-43-3, 34-43-5, 34-43-6, 34-43-7, 34-43-9, 34-43-11, 34-43-12, 34-43-14, 34-43-15, 34-43-17, 34-43-20, 34-43-21 am'd; Sec. 34-43-10 repealed
Title
Massage Therapy, Board of, massage therapists further regulated, penalties increased, Secs. 34-43-3, 34-43-5, 34-43-6, 34-43-7, 34-43-9, 34-43-11, 34-43-12, 34-43-14, 34-43-15, 34-43-17, 34-43-20, 34-43-21 am'd; Sec. 34-43-10 repealed
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Hill (M) motion to Table (Y: 70 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Hill (M) motion to Table (Y: 70 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2016-03-23 | House | Engrossed |
2016-03-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 412 |
2016-03-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 411 |
2016-03-23 | House | Hill (M) Amendment Offered |
2016-03-23 | House | Hill (M) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 410 |
2016-03-23 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered |
2016-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |