AL HB166 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to alcoholic beverages; to amend Section 2 of Act 2022-431 of the 2022 Regular Session, now appearing as Section 28-3A-13.3, Code of Alabama 1975, to revise the amounts of alcoholic beverages that may be sold curbside.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to alcoholic beverages; to amend Section 2 of Act 2022-431 of the 2022 Regular Session, now appearing as Section 28-3A-13.3, Code of Alabama 1975, to revise the amounts of alcoholic beverages that may be sold curbside.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-23 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Table JR8JYY-1 (Y: 70 N: 19 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Adopt 3T80EV-1 (Y: 72 N: 14 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24HouseEnacted
2023-05-24HouseEnrolled
2023-05-24HouseEnrolled
2023-05-23HouseConcur In and Adopt
2023-05-03SenateRead A Third Time And Passed As Amended
2023-05-03SenateAdopt
2023-05-03SenateOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-05-03SenateAMD/SUB MP6B11-1
2023-04-27SenateRead Second Time in Second House
2023-04-26SenateReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-04-26SenateReported Favorably from Senate Tourism
2023-04-25SenateReferred to Committee to Senate Tourism
2023-04-25HouseRead First Time in Second House
2023-04-20HouseRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-04-20HouseRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-04-20HouseTable JR8JYY-1
2023-04-20HouseAdopt 3T80EV-1
2023-04-20HouseOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-04-05HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-04-05HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-04-05HouseReported Favorably from House Economic Development and Tourism
2023-04-05HouseAmendment/Substitute by House Economic Development and Tourism 3T80EV-1
2023-04-04HouseAmendment/Substitute by House Economic Development and Tourism IFTJZZ-1
2023-03-21HouseIntroduced and Referred to House Economic Development and Tourism
2023-03-21HouseRead First Time in House of Origin

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/HB166-int.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/HB166-eng.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/HB166-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/3T80EV-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/IFTJZZ-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/JR8JYY-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/MP6B11-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-HKK163-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-HKK163-2.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-HKK163-3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc319
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc320
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc562
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc563
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc826

Bill Comments

feedback