AL HB166 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Forwarded to Governor at 12:09 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Forwarded to Governor at 12:09 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Marriage and Family Therapy Board, practice of marriage and family therapy further defined to include diagnosis of mental and emotional problems, certain limitations deleted, Sec. 34-17A-3 am'd.
Title
Marriage and Family Therapy Board, practice of marriage and family therapy further defined to include diagnosis of mental and emotional problems, certain limitations deleted, Sec. 34-17A-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Davis motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 92) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 68 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 92) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 68 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 12:09 p.m. on March 15, 2018. |
2018-03-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-285. |
2018-03-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-15 | House | Davis motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 803 |
2018-03-15 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 781 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 780 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Ward Amendment Offered |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 655 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2018-02-06 | House | Engrossed |
2018-02-06 | House | Members intended to cosponsor |
2018-02-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 193 |
2018-02-06 | House | Sells intended to vote "Yea" |
2018-02-06 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 192 |
2018-02-06 | House | Moore (M) Amendment Offered |
2018-02-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |