AL HB164 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ethics, filing of statement of economic interests by candidates for municipal office further provided for, Sec. 36-25-15 am'd.
Title
Ethics, filing of statement of economic interests by candidates for municipal office further provided for, Sec. 36-25-15 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 187 |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 186 |
2020-03-03 | House | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2020-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |