AL HB164 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Passed Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Passed Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Exemption Reform Act, united appeal fund entities and supported charities, grace period to obtain or renew certificate of exemption from Dept. of Revenue provided through Sept. 30, 2018, Sec. 40-9-12.1added
Title
Tax Exemption Reform Act, united appeal fund entities and supported charities, grace period to obtain or renew certificate of exemption from Dept. of Revenue provided through Sept. 30, 2018, Sec. 40-9-12.1added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-198. |
2018-03-06 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 6, 2018 at 5:40 p.m. on March 6, 2018. |
2018-03-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 629 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Figures motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Figures motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 624 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2018-02-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 198 |
2018-02-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |