AL HB163 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax, optional standard deduction amount and adjusted gross income range allowable for maximum optional standard deduction and dependent exemption, increased, Secs. 40-18-15, 40-18-19 am'd.
Title
Income tax, optional standard deduction amount and adjusted gross income range allowable for maximum optional standard deduction and dependent exemption, increased, Secs. 40-18-15, 40-18-19 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Greer [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1074 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 671 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - HBIR: Greer motion to Adopt Roll Call 670 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 671 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - HBIR: Greer motion to Adopt Roll Call 670 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-297. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1074 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2022-03-17 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2022-03-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 671 |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 18 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 18 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |