AL HB163 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Trusts, Uniform Trust Decanting Act, enacted, decanting power of fiduciaries of certain trusts to distribute assets of the trusts to other trusts, fiduciary duties, procedures, notice, limitations, trusts for the care of animals, authorized
Title
Trusts, Uniform Trust Decanting Act, enacted, decanting power of fiduciaries of certain trusts to distribute assets of the trusts to other trusts, fiduciary duties, procedures, notice, limitations, trusts for the care of animals, authorized
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-519. |
2018-03-27 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1081 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2018-02-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 352 |
2018-02-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services |