AL HB162 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Montgomery Co., sheriffs, compensation and expense allowance, Act 2015-263, 2015 Reg. Sess., repealed
Title
Montgomery Co., sheriffs, compensation and expense allowance, Act 2015-263, 2015 Reg. Sess., repealed
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Ingram [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019. |
2019-05-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-235. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 733 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 132 |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-04-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation |