AL HB161 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Read for the second time and rereferred to committee Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Read for the second time and rereferred to committee Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jackson Co., human sewage biosolids, application to land as fertilizer or soil amendment, prohibited, exception, const. amend.
Title
Jackson Co., human sewage biosolids, application to land as fertilizer or soil amendment, prohibited, exception, const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. James Hanes [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to adopt Local Application (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and rereferred to committee Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-03-21 | House | Motion to adopt Local Application adopted Roll Call 17 |
2019-03-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 16 |
2019-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |