AL HB157 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Delivered to Governor at 2:11 p.m. on March 10, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Juveniles, grounds for termination of parental rights, factors for juvenile courts to consider, permanency plans for children, Secs. 12-15-319, 26-10A-17 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles, grounds for termination of parental rights, factors for juvenile courts to consider, permanency plans for children, Secs. 12-15-319, 26-10A-17 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:11 p.m. on March 10, 2020.
2020-03-10HouseAssigned Act No. 2020-34.
2020-03-10HouseClerk of the House Certification
2020-03-10SenateSignature Requested
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-03-05HousePassed Second House
2020-03-05SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 323
2020-03-05SenateThird Reading Passed
2020-02-27SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-02-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth and Human Services
2020-02-25HouseCosponsors Added
2020-02-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 101
2020-02-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2020-02-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-02-06HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback