AL HB157 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 10:26 a.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 10:26 a.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations, supplemental for fiscal year ending Sept. 30, 2017, appropriations to the Alabama Forestry Commission, Forensic Sciences Dept., Insurance Dept., and Board of Prosthetics and Orthotics
Title
Appropriations, supplemental for fiscal year ending Sept. 30, 2017, appropriations to the Alabama Forestry Commission, Forensic Sciences Dept., Insurance Dept., and Board of Prosthetics and Orthotics
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle South [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - South motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Holmes (A) motion to Adjourn (Y: 16 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-05-16 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Holmes (A) motion to Adjourn (Y: 16 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:26 a.m. on May 17, 2017. |
2017-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-318. |
2017-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2017-05-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-16 | House | South motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 914 |
2017-05-16 | House | Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 913 |
2017-05-16 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 925 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 924 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2017-03-14 | House | Engrossed |
2017-03-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 260 |
2017-03-14 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 259 |
2017-03-14 | House | Holmes (A) motion to Adjourn lost Roll Call 258 |
2017-03-14 | House | South Amendment Offered |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |