AL HB156 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 5:44 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Epinephrine, anaphylaxis preparedness program, St. Department of Education and local boards of education to implement by 2015-2016 scholastic year a plan for use of premeasured autoinjectable epinephrine at schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Epinephrine, anaphylaxis preparedness program, St. Department of Education and local boards of education to implement by 2015-2016 scholastic year a plan for use of premeasured autoinjectable epinephrine at schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Tuggle motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 75) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseForwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 5:44 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-405.
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03HouseEnrolled
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-03SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2014-04-03HouseTuggle motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1114
2014-04-03HouseConcurrence Requested
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended adopted Roll Call 1196
2014-04-03SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1195
2014-04-03SenateMarsh first Substitute Offered
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Reconsider pending
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1181
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-02-26SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health
2014-02-13HouseEngrossed
2014-02-13HouseCosponsors Added
2014-02-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 285
2014-02-13HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 284
2014-02-13HouseTuggle Amendment Offered
2014-02-13HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 283
2014-02-13HouseEducation Policy first Substitute Offered
2014-02-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2014-01-14HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB156
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB156-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB156-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB156-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=485517&VOTE=283&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=485547&VOTE=284&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=485563&VOTE=285&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=485567&VOTE=286&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500409&VOTE=1181&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500512&VOTE=1195&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500513&VOTE=1196&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500731&VOTE=1114&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback