AL HB155 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Delivered to Governor at 2:24 p.m. on March 15, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Delivered to Governor at 2:24 p.m. on March 15, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement System of Alabama, surviving spouse benefit of a retirement eligible member who dies in active service, benefit-option amended under District Attorneys' Plan, Judges' and Clerks' Plan, Teachers' and Employees' Retirement System, Secs. 12-17-277.6, 12-18-156, 16-25-14, 36-27-16 am'd.
Title
Retirement System of Alabama, surviving spouse benefit of a retirement eligible member who dies in active service, benefit-option amended under District Attorneys' Plan, Judges' and Clerks' Plan, Teachers' and Employees' Retirement System, Secs. 12-17-277.6, 12-18-156, 16-25-14, 36-27-16 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 562 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - SBIR: Weaver motion to Adopt Roll Call 561 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 59 (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 58 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - HBIR: Ellis motion to Adopt Roll Call 57 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - SBIR: Weaver motion to Adopt Roll Call 561 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 59 (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 58 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - HBIR: Ellis motion to Adopt Roll Call 57 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:24 p.m. on March 15, 2022. |
2022-03-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-184. |
2022-03-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 562 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2022-02-08 | House | Engrossed |
2022-02-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 59 |
2022-02-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 58 |
2022-02-08 | House | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered |
2022-02-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-01-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 17 | 277.6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 18 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 25 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 27 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |