AL HB155 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:51 p.m. on April 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:51 p.m. on April 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lease tax, state and local levies payment and collection based on either seller's place of business or where delivered, automotive vehicles paid where vehicle registered after first payment, Sec. 40-12-222 am'd.
Title
Lease tax, state and local levies payment and collection based on either seller's place of business or where delivered, automotive vehicles paid where vehicle registered after first payment, Sec. 40-12-222 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 3:51 p.m. on April 23, 2019. |
2019-04-23 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-89. |
2019-04-23 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-04-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-04-23 | House | Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 307 |
2019-04-23 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 347 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 346 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2019-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 128 |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |