AL HB155 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on February 25, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on February 25, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Service Commission, telecommunication services, retail services, complaints procedure not to apply, Sec. 37-2A-4 am'd.
Title
Public Service Commission, telecommunication services, retail services, complaints procedure not to apply, Sec. 37-2A-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on February 25, 2014. |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-82. |
2014-02-25 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 439 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |
2014-02-11 | House | Engrossed |
2014-02-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 206 |
2014-02-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 205 |
2014-02-11 | House | Hill Amendment Offered |
2014-02-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 204 |
2014-02-11 | House | Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure Amendment Offered |
2014-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |