AL HB153 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 8:42 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 8:42 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education, law enforcement officers, firefighters, and rescue squad members, higher education assistance program for the children under certain conditions, Sec. 16-64-6, 36-21-102 am'd.
Title
Education, law enforcement officers, firefighters, and rescue squad members, higher education assistance program for the children under certain conditions, Sec. 16-64-6, 36-21-102 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Lovvorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1332 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 1331 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 604 (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 603 (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Lovvorn motion to Adopt Roll Call 602 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 1331 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 604 (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 603 (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Lovvorn motion to Adopt Roll Call 602 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 8:42 p.m. on May 4, 2021. |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-425. |
2021-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1332 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2021-04-01 | House | Engrossed |
2021-04-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 604 |
2021-04-01 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 603 |
2021-04-01 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 64 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 21 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |