AL HB153 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and offenses, law enforcement officers, crime of making a false statement to a law enforcement officer, created

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses, law enforcement officers, crime of making a false statement to a law enforcement officer, created

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateFurther Consideration
2019-05-31SenateWard motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-31SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-05-29SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-28SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2019-05-23HouseEngrossed
2019-05-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1053
2019-05-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1052
2019-05-23HouseEngland Amendment Offered
2019-05-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1051
2019-05-23HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-03-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB153&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB153-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199455-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201990-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=623831&VOTE=1051&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=623833&VOTE=1052&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=623834&VOTE=1053&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback