AL HB151 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Military, spouses, occupational licensing boards, date revised by which rules must be adopted, timeframe extended for which a temporary permit to practice is effective, Sec. 31-1-6 am'd.
Title
Military, spouses, occupational licensing boards, date revised by which rules must be adopted, timeframe extended for which a temporary permit to practice is effective, Sec. 31-1-6 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 183 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Moore (P) motion to Adopt Roll Call 182 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Moore (P) motion to Adopt Roll Call 182 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2022-02-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 183 |
2022-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB80 (Same As) 2022-01-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs