AL HB151 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal elections, dates for, revised, ballot printing requirements further provided for, time frames for run-off elections specified, Secs. 11-46-6, 11-46-21, 11-46-22, 11-46-25, 11-46-26, 11-46-55, 17-11-12 am'd.
Title
Municipal elections, dates for, revised, ballot printing requirements further provided for, time frames for run-off elections specified, Secs. 11-46-6, 11-46-21, 11-46-22, 11-46-25, 11-46-26, 11-46-55, 17-11-12 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SB119 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Assigned Act No. 2021-157.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 46 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 46 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 46 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 46 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 46 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 46 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 11 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |