AL HB151 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax, licenses from Revenue Dept., two-year surety bond required with new or renewal sales tax license registration under certain conditions and certain non-compliant licenses, Sec. 40-23-6 am'd.
Title
Sales tax, licenses from Revenue Dept., two-year surety bond required with new or renewal sales tax license registration under certain conditions and certain non-compliant licenses, Sec. 40-23-6 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-508. |
2018-03-27 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1078 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2018-02-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 462 |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |