AL HB151 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Forwarded to Governor on March 20, 2012 at 4:30 p. m. on March 20, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Forwarded to Governor on March 20, 2012 at 4:30 p. m. on March 20, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Development Office and Director of Development changed to Commerce Department and Secretary of Commerce, assistant secretaries of commerce, employment of certain persons outside of Merit System, authorized, Secs. 41-9-201, 41-9-202, 41-9-202.1, 41-9-203, 41-9-204 am'd.
Title
Alabama Development Office and Director of Development changed to Commerce Department and Secretary of Commerce, assistant secretaries of commerce, employment of certain persons outside of Merit System, authorized, Secs. 41-9-201, 41-9-202, 41-9-202.1, 41-9-203, 41-9-204 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Forwarded to Governor on March 20, 2012 at 4:30 p. m. on March 20, 2012. | |
2012-03-20 | Assigned Act No. 2012-167. | |
2012-03-20 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-03-20 | Enrolled | |
2012-03-20 | Signature Requested | |
2012-03-20 | Passed Second House | |
2012-03-20 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 335 | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-09 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Job Creation and Economic Development | |
2012-02-09 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 3 | |
2012-02-09 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 2 | |
2012-02-09 | Economic Development and Tourism Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |