AL HB150 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Finance and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Finance and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Southern Preparatory Academy, appropriation
Title
Southern Preparatory Academy, appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 609 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 609 |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-07 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |