AL HB15 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2012 at 10:02 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Consumer credit reports, security freezes, procedure for placing, removing, and temporarily lifting, fees, notice, fines

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer credit reports, security freezes, procedure for placing, removing, and temporarily lifting, fees, notice, fines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-17 - House - Bridges motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2012 at 10:02 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-500.
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Buskey intended to vote "Yea"
2012-05-16 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2012-05-16 Bridges motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1589
2012-05-16 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1461
2012-05-16 Holtzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1460
2012-05-16 Judiciary Amendment Offered
2012-05-16 Third Reading Passed
2012-04-05 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-03-15 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2012-03-14 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 334
2012-03-14 Third Reading Passed
2012-02-16 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-07 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB15
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB15-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB15-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=430800&VOTE=334&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450349&VOTE=1460&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450350&VOTE=1461&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450499&VOTE=1589&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback