AL HB149 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wallace-Folsom Savings Investment Plan Act, ACES Program, name of and name of Admin Fund and savings accounts changed to AL Comprehensive Education Savings Program, definitions clarified, Secs. 16-33C-3, 16-33C-10 am'd.
Title
Wallace-Folsom Savings Investment Plan Act, ACES Program, name of and name of Admin Fund and savings accounts changed to AL Comprehensive Education Savings Program, definitions clarified, Secs. 16-33C-3, 16-33C-10 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Whitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 177 |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services |