AL HB149 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Delivered to Governor at 5:35 p.m. on February 28, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Delivered to Governor at 5:35 p.m. on February 28, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Henry Co., revenue commissioner, expense allowance for current term, salary increase next term of office, budget functions and operations of office combined
Title
Henry Co., revenue commissioner, expense allowance for current term, salary increase next term of office, budget functions and operations of office combined
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:35 p.m. on February 28, 2017. |
2017-02-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-44. |
2017-02-28 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-28 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 142 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-02-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 17 |
2017-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |