AL HB149 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax, automotive batteries, sales tax to be due on the net price less any exchanges, Sec. 40-23-2 am'd.
Title
Sales tax, automotive batteries, sales tax to be due on the net price less any exchanges, Sec. 40-23-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 534 |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |