AL HB149 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Civil Procedure, certain caregiver volunteers immune from civil action, Sec. 6-5-332 am'd.
Title
Civil Procedure, certain caregiver volunteers immune from civil action, Sec. 6-5-332 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Senate - Holtzclaw table Holtzclaw motion to recommit (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Holtzclaw table Holtzclaw motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 843 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 699 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Smitherman motion to rerefer |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-25 | House | Beckman intended to vote "Yea" |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 849 |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |