AL HB148 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to St. Clair County; to amend Section 4 of Act 85-435, 1985 Regular Session (Acts 1985, p. 403); and to create and provide for the distribution of an additional license tag fee of two dollars ($2).
Title
Relating to St. Clair County; to amend Section 4 of Act 85-435, 1985 Regular Session (Acts 1985, p. 403); and to create and provide for the distribution of an additional license tag fee of two dollars ($2).
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 95 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-11 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 95 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Enacted |
2023-04-20 | House | Enrolled |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-20 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Local Legislation |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Local Legislation |
2023-04-11 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-11 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-11 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-06 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported Favorably from House Local Legislation |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Local Legislation |
2023-03-21 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |