AL HB148 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Delivered to Governor at 9:31 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Delivered to Governor at 9:31 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public roads, vacation of certain public roads or streets further provided for, Sec. 23-4-20 am'd.
Title
Public roads, vacation of certain public roads or streets further provided for, Sec. 23-4-20 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - Johnson (R) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:31 p.m. on April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-333. |
2014-04-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2014-04-01 | House | Johnson (R) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1051 |
2014-04-01 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1091 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1090 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2014-02-04 | House | Engrossed |
2014-02-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 147 |
2014-02-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 146 |
2014-02-04 | House | Johnson (R) 2nd Amendment Offered |
2014-02-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-04 | House | Johnson (R) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 143 |
2014-02-04 | House | Johnson (R) 1st Amendment Offered |
2014-02-04 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2014-01-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |