AL HB147 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to St. Clair County; providing that the offices of judge of probate, revenue commissioner, and sheriff shall be reimbursed from the county general fund for monetary loss resulting from the performance of official duties for errors or mistakes made in good faith, not to exceed a certain maximum per annum; and providing for the voiding of licenses issued and other transactions based on worthless or forged checks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to St. Clair County; providing that the offices of judge of probate, revenue commissioner, and sheriff shall be reimbursed from the county general fund for monetary loss resulting from the performance of official duties for errors or mistakes made in good faith, not to exceed a certain maximum per annum; and providing for the voiding of licenses issued and other transactions based on worthless or forged checks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-20 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 91 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-20HouseEnacted
2023-04-20HouseEnrolled
2023-04-20SenateReady to Enroll
2023-04-20SenateRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-04-20SenateOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-04-19SenateRead Second Time in Second House
2023-04-18SenateReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-04-18SenateReported Favorably from Senate Local Legislation
2023-04-11SenateReferred to Committee to Senate Local Legislation
2023-04-11HouseRead First Time in Second House
2023-04-11HouseRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-04-11HouseOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-04-06HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-04-06HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-04-06HouseReported Favorably from House Local Legislation
2023-03-21HouseIntroduced and Referred to House Local Legislation
2023-03-21HouseRead First Time in House of Origin

Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback