AL HB147 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:00 p.m. on March 3, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Municipal occupational taxes, prohibited if not already in effect unless authorized by local law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal occupational taxes, prohibited if not already in effect unless authorized by local law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 74 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Sells motion to Table (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Sells motion to Table (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Sells motion to Table (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 75 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseForwarded to Governor at 4:00 p.m. on March 3, 2020.
2020-03-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2020-03-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2020-14.
2020-03-03SenateSignature Requested
2020-03-03HouseEnrolled
2020-03-03HousePassed Second House
2020-02-27SenateChambliss motion to Reconsider and Table adopted Voice Vote
2020-02-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 222
2020-02-27SenateSingleton motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 221
2020-02-27SenateSingleton first Substitute Offered
2020-02-27SenateFigures motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 220
2020-02-27SenateFigures Amendment Offered
2020-02-27SenateColeman-Madison motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 219
2020-02-27SenateColeman-Madison Amendment Offered
2020-02-27SenateThird Reading Passed
2020-02-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-02-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2020-02-11HouseEngrossed
2020-02-11HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 10
2020-02-11HouseSells motion to Table adopted Roll Call 9
2020-02-11HouseHatcher 3rd Amendment Offered
2020-02-11HouseSells motion to Table adopted Roll Call 8
2020-02-11HouseHatcher 2nd Amendment Offered
2020-02-11HouseSells motion to Table adopted Roll Call 7
2020-02-11HouseHatcher 1st Amendment Offered
2020-02-11HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 6
2020-02-11HouseCounty and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered
2020-02-11HouseThird Reading Passed
2020-02-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2020-02-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB147&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/HB147-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/HB147-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/HB147-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/204606-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/204806-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/204808-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/204807-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/205868-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/205141-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/205775-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=630199&VOTE=6&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=630201&VOTE=7&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=630203&VOTE=8&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=630205&VOTE=9&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=630206&VOTE=10&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=633382&VOTE=219&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=633384&VOTE=220&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=633386&VOTE=221&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=633387&VOTE=222&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback