AL HB146 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county entities, claims for expenses denied by state agencies, State Board of Adjustment to approve claims unless state agency has adopted and followed written procedures, Sec. 41-9-65 am'd. (2010-20887)
Title
Counties and county entities, claims for expenses denied by state agencies, State Board of Adjustment to approve claims unless state agency has adopted and followed written procedures, Sec. 41-9-65 am'd. (2010-20887)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - House - Laird motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned Act No. 2010-693 on 04/29/2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2010-04-22 | Laird motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1138 | |
2010-04-22 | Concurrence Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1203 | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1202 | |
2010-04-22 | Benefield first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2010-02-04 | Engrossed | |
2010-02-04 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 200 | |
2010-02-04 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 199 | |
2010-02-04 | Laird Amendment Offered | |
2010-02-04 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 198 | |
2010-02-04 | Government Appropriations first Substitute Offered | |
2010-02-04 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-28 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Appropriations |