AL HB144 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, municipal elections, runoff elections eliminated when only two candidates run and there is a tie; county and precinct elections, tie votes, decided by judge of probate by lot
Title
Elections, municipal elections, runoff elections eliminated when only two candidates run and there is a tie; county and precinct elections, tie votes, decided by judge of probate by lot
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1027 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 215 (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 214 (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Jones (S) motion to Adopt Roll Call 213 (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 215 (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 214 (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Jones (S) motion to Adopt Roll Call 213 (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-337. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1027 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-02-16 | House | Engrossed |
2022-02-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 215 |
2022-02-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 214 |
2022-02-16 | House | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered |
2022-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-01-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |