AL HB142 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance, insurance fraud, elements of modified, overcharging insurers included, Secs. 27-12A-2, 27-27-26 am'd.
Title
Insurance, insurance fraud, elements of modified, overcharging insurers included, Secs. 27-12A-2, 27-27-26 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - Hill motion to Table (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - Hill motion to Table (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-397. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2013-05-20 | House | Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1285 |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1195 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1194 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Banking and Insurance Amendment Offered |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 698 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Smitherman motion to rerefer |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2013-04-24 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 772 |
2013-04-24 | House | Hill motion to Table adopted Roll Call 771 |
2013-04-24 | House | Insurance first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-24 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2013-02-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |