AL HB142 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, tax exemption for Class 1-5 municipalities cultural districts
Title
Taxation, tax exemption for Class 1-5 municipalities cultural districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Further Consideration | |
2012-05-16 | Singleton Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-05-16 | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2012-04-12 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 716 | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 715 | |
2012-04-12 | Collins Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 714 | |
2012-04-12 | Economic Development and Tourism Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |