AL HB140 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Forwarded to Executive Department on March 31, 2022 at 12:15 p.m. on March 22, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Forwarded to Executive Department on March 31, 2022 at 12:15 p.m. on March 22, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tuskegee University, appropriation
Title
Tuskegee University, appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 864 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 863 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 497 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 496 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 863 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 497 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 496 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Forwarded to Executive Department on March 31, 2022 at 12:15 p.m. on March 22, 2022. |
2022-03-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-203. |
2022-03-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-31 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 864 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 497 |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |