AL HB140 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stored wire and electronic communications, transactional location records, pen registers, and trap and trace devices, federal law to be followed regarding these devices, use of such devices authorized in emergency situations relating to missing persons
Title
Stored wire and electronic communications, transactional location records, pen registers, and trap and trace devices, federal law to be followed regarding these devices, use of such devices authorized in emergency situations relating to missing persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2010-02-02 | England motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-02 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2010-02-02 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-01-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |