AL HB14 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ALEA, felony drug trafficking wiretapping, interception of wire, oral, or electronic communications, Attorney General to authorize to apply for court order for intercept and to apply for intercept orders, disclosure of recorded communications, penalties for violations, Secs. 20-2A-1 to 20-2A-15, inclusive, added; Sec. 15-5-40 am'd
Title
ALEA, felony drug trafficking wiretapping, interception of wire, oral, or electronic communications, Attorney General to authorize to apply for court order for intercept and to apply for intercept orders, disclosure of recorded communications, penalties for violations, Secs. 20-2A-1 to 20-2A-15, inclusive, added; Sec. 15-5-40 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 173 |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 172 |
2020-03-03 | House | Judiciary Amendment #3 Offered |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 171 |
2020-03-03 | House | Judiciary Amendment #2 Offered |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 170 |
2020-03-03 | House | Judiciary Amendment #1 Offered |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments |
2020-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |