AL HB139 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipality, Mayor/Council form of government, council meetings, cancellation for lack of quorum, procedures, Sec. 11-43-50 am'd
Title
Municipality, Mayor/Council form of government, council meetings, cancellation for lack of quorum, procedures, Sec. 11-43-50 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Governmental Affairs |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2013-04-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1005 |
2013-04-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |