AL HB138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Civil immunity, provided to persons providing transportation to health care providers without compensation, exceptions
Title
Civil immunity, provided to persons providing transportation to health care providers without compensation, exceptions
Sponsors
Rep. K.L. Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019. |
2019-05-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-450. |
2019-05-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1420 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-23 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 974 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 973 |
2019-05-23 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |