AL HB134 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Delivered to Governor at 1:13 p.m. on March 31, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Delivered to Governor at 1:13 p.m. on March 31, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers Retirement System, 30-year service retirement, member contribution rate increased, Secs. 16-25-14, 16-25-21 am'd.
Title
Teachers Retirement System, 30-year service retirement, member contribution rate increased, Secs. 16-25-14, 16-25-21 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Baker motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 819 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 873 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 872 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 871 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 31 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - HBIR: Baker motion to Adopt Roll Call 30 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 873 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 872 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 871 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 31 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - HBIR: Baker motion to Adopt Roll Call 30 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:13 p.m. on March 31, 2022. |
2022-03-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-222. |
2022-03-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-31 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-03-31 | House | Baker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 819 |
2022-03-31 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 873 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 872 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2022-02-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 31 |
2022-02-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 25 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 25 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |