AL HB131 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sales and use tax, durable medical equipment and medical supplies revised.
Title
Sales and use tax, durable medical equipment and medical supplies revised.
Sponsors
Rep. Mack Butler [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Butler substitution IL9AWZW-1 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Butler substitution IL9AWZW-1 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Pending Senate State Governmental Affairs |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on State Governmental Affairs |
2024-02-22 | House | Engrossed |
2024-02-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 103 |
2024-02-22 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 102 IL9AWZW-1 |
2024-02-22 | House | SG Substitute Offered IL9AWZW-1 |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-07 | House | Pending House State Government |
2024-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on State Government |