AL HB131 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Forwarded to Secretary of State on April 15, 2021 at 1:41 p.m. on April 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Forwarded to Secretary of State on April 15, 2021 at 1:41 p.m. on April 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bail, criminal cases, creates Aniah's law, Legislature may designate offenses not eligible for bail, const. amend
Title
Bail, criminal cases, creates Aniah's law, Legislature may designate offenses not eligible for bail, const. amend
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - Brown (C) motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 850 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 792 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt Roll Call 791 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SBIR: Sessions motion to Adopt Roll Call 790 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 86 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - HBIR: Brown (C) motion to Adopt Roll Call 85 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 792 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt Roll Call 791 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SBIR: Sessions motion to Adopt Roll Call 790 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 86 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - HBIR: Brown (C) motion to Adopt Roll Call 85 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Forwarded to Secretary of State on April 15, 2021 at 1:41 p.m. on April 15, 2021. |
2021-04-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-201. |
2021-04-15 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-15 | House | Brown (C) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 850 |
2021-04-15 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 792 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 791 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Figures Amendment Offered |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2021-02-23 | House | Alexander intended to vote "Yea" |
2021-02-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 86 |
2021-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |